Thomas v. Norfolk Southrn Railway Company
Plaintiff: Rufus Thomas, Jr.
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02043
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Adams, Hilary)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/1/2019. (dob)
June 29, 2019 Filing 10 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/29/19, 7/30/19, 7/31/19, 8/1/19, 8/2/19, 8/30/19, 9/3/19, 11/26/19, 11/27/19, 12/2/19, 12/3/19, 12/23/19, 12/26/19, 12/27/19, 12/30/19, by Daryl Glenn Clarida. (Clarida, Daryl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Clarida, Daryl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by Rufus Thomas, Jr.(Moss, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Disclosures by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Adams, Hilary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Clarida, Daryl)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Discovery ends on 10/28/2019.(Clarida, Daryl) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Rufus Thomas, Jr. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Moss, John)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (bnw)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rufus Thomas, Jr.(Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8641982) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Norfolk Southrn Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Daryl Glenn Clarida
Represented By: Hilary H. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: John Ashton Moss
Represented By: John Deaton Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?