Fedance v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Fedance
Defendant: Ryan Felton and Clifford "T.I" Joseph Harris, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02125
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenneth Fedance. Ryan Felton waiver mailed on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Doss, Jason)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission of Alexander Loftus Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 5/21/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tcc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Katryna Lyn Spearman on behalf of Ryan Felton (Spearman, Katryna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Lowther on behalf of Ryan Felton (Lowther, Joshua)
May 17, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexander Loftus Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8665941). Attorney Alexander Nicholas Loftus added appearing on behalf of Kenneth Fedance (cdg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ryan Felton. (tcc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Clifford "T.I" Joseph Harris, Jr.. (tcc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kenneth Fedance for Defendant Ryan Felton (Doss, Jason)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kenneth Fedance for Defendant Clifford "T.I." Harris, Jr. (Doss, Jason)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexander Loftus Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8665941) with Brief In Support by Kenneth Fedance. (Doss, Jason)
May 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ryan Moore re #3 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (tcc)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application for Admission of Ryan Moore Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 5/15/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tcc)
May 15, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #2 APPLICATION for Admission of Ryan Moore Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8656707). Attorney Ryan Moore added appearing on behalf of Kenneth Fedance (pmb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Admission of Ryan Moore Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8656707) with Brief In Support by Kenneth Fedance. (Doss, Jason)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kenneth Fedance. (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADANDC-8652889) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fedance v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Fedance
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Loftus
Represented By: Patrick Jones
Represented By: Ryan Moore
Represented By: Ryan Frederick Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Felton
Represented By: Katryna Lyn Spearman
Represented By: Joshua S. Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford "T.I" Joseph Harris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?