The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Stone et al

Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: Dustin Gerow and Tina Stone
Case Number: 1:2019cv02153
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Brieske, James)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. This case is assigned to a four-month discovery track. Discovery shall be completed on or before November 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/11/19. (jta)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Brieske, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Brieske, James)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tina Stone. Tina Stone waiver mailed on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Brieske, James) Modified on 6/12/2019 to edit text(bnw).
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Gerow's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Dustin Gerow. Discovery ends on 11/7/2019.(Gower, Anne) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 30, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dustin Gerow answer due 6/10/2019. (dob)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Dustin W. Gerow served on 5/19/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Brieske, James) Modified on 5/30/2019 to edit applicable party (dob).
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Brieske, James)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dustin Gerow, Tina Stone. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8656670))(bnw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8656670) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Complaint in Underlying Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit B Deposition of Dustin Gerow, #4 Exhibit C Reservation of Rights Letter, #5 Exhibit D Cincinnati Policy)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Stone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Gerow
Represented By: Anne Dodson Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Jena Grace Emory
Represented By: James T. Brieske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?