Angel v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Nicolas Jaramillo Angel
Defendant: Denise Frazier, L. Francis Cissna, Christopher Wray and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv02154
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (bnp)
July 5, 2019 DUPLICATE ENTRY. Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (jkl)
July 5, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (bnp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Nicolas Jaramillo Angel (Cohen, Marshall)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Nicolas Jaramillo Angel. L. Francis Cissna served on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Denise Frazier served on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Kevin K. McAleenan served on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Christopher Wray served on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cissna - executed summons, #2 Summons Wray - executed summons, #3 Summons Frazier - executed summons, #4 Summons Barr - executed summons, #5 Summons Pak - executed summons)(Cohen, Marshall)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna, Denise Frazier, Kevin K. McAleenan, Christopher Wray. (Attachments: #1 Summons Denise Frazier, #2 Summons Kevin K McAleenan, #3 Summons L Francis Cissna, #4 Summons US Attorney Byung J Pak, #5 Summons US Attorney General William Barr)(bnw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall Lewis Cohen on behalf of Nicolas Jaramillo Angel (bnw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITON FOR HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR NATURALIZATION; COMPLAINT FOR MANDAMUS; AND PETITION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by Nicolas Jaramillo Angel. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC- 8656735) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit exh. A - notice of receipt, #3 Exhibit exh. B - intvw. results, #4 Exhibit exh. C - N-14, #5 Exhibit exh. D - case status)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angel v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Jaramillo Angel
Represented By: Marshall Lewis Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?