Jones et al v. Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC
Plaintiff: Tarsha Jones and Janel Jones
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02162
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay pending outcome of arbitration. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/28/2019. (dob)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warnock, Henry)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #3 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Stay filed by Janel Jones, Tarsha Jones. (Marx, Robert)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #3 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Stay to and including 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/29/2019. (dob)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss or stay pending arbitration (doc. 3) re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Stay by Janel Jones, Tarsha Jones. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marx, Robert)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Janel Jones, Tarsha Jones. (Marx, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dollar Tree, Inc., Other Affiliate Family Dollar Stores, Inc. for Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC by Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC.(Warnock, Henry)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration with Brief In Support by Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Warnock, Henry) . Added MOTION to Stay on 5/21/2019 (bjh).
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8657543) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Superior Court), #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jonathan Edler, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Lanelle Carr, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC
Represented By: Patrick McNary Corley
Represented By: Henry Warnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarsha Jones
Represented By: Robert Nathan Marx
Represented By: Jean Simonoff Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janel Jones
Represented By: Robert Nathan Marx
Represented By: Jean Simonoff Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?