Stephens v. Atlanta Housing Authority, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Kalyn Stephens
Defendant: La Toya Matthews, Jacqueline Whatley, Georgia Department of Community Affairs, Lena Brumfield, Karrnetta West, Noel Khalil, James Grauley, Atlanta Housing Authority, Georgia, Tonya Hall, Columbia Residential Management, Monicessha Fluker, Delermena Lewis, Morgan Johnson, Aaron Swain, Lynn Cassell, Cynthia McDonald, Darlene Crite and Brandon Riddick-Seals
Case Number: 1:2019cv02195
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Janet F King
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal, #6 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA 11th- Circuit. Case Number 19-12136-FF. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 USCA Acknowledgment of #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Kalyn Stephens. Case Appealed to USCA 11th- Circuit. Case Number 19-12136-FF. (pjm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #6 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re: #6 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Clerk's Judgment and #4 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous and Order for filing restriction, by Kalyn Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pjm)
May 22, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kalyn Stephens re #4 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous and #5 Clerk's Judgment. (sap)
May 22, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (sap)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action as frivolous. (sap) --Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS pursuant to 28 USC 1915A. No additional civil lawsuits may be filed by this Plaintiff without paying the full filing fee or obtaining the express permission in writing of the undersigned. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (sap)
May 20, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kalyn Stephens re #2 Order. (sap)
May 20, 2019 Submission of #3 Complaint to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. for a frivolity determination. (sap)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kalyn Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (sap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to submit this action to the appropriate District Court Judge for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 5/17/2019. (sap)
May 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Janet F. King terminated; Referred in error. (sap)
May 16, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (eop)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Kalyn Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit -Letter, #4 Exhibit -Envelope)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Atlanta Housing Authority, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Toya Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Community Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lena Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karrnetta West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Grauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta Housing Authority, Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Residential Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monicessha Fluker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delermena Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Crite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Riddick-Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalyn Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?