Kirby et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare

Plaintiff: Tonya Beach, David Frohman, Audrey Logan, Dioli Azofeifa, Frances Kirby, Wanda Silva and John David Marks
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02212
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Submission of #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross.
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dioli Azofeifa, Tonya Beach, David Frohman, Frances Kirby, Audrey Logan, John David Marks, Wanda Silva. (Doss, Jason)
June 24, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney Briana Black as to Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc. regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of E. Desmond Hogan; GRANTING #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allison M. Ryan; and GRANTING #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Briana Black. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/24/19.If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Archer, T.)
June 20, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Briana Black Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8729882). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney James L. Hollis added appearing on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc. (jkm)
June 20, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Allison M. Ryan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8729865). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney James L. Hollis added appearing on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc. (jkm)
June 20, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of E. Desmond Hogan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8729832). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney James L. Hollis added appearing on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc. (jkm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Briana Black Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8729882). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hollis, James)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Allison M. Ryan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8729865). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hollis, James)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of E. Desmond Hogan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8729832). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hollis, James)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time through 6/21/19 for defendants to file a response to the #5 Motion to Remand and extending time through 7/22/19 for plaintiffs to file a response to defendants' #6 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/3/19. (jpa)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses re: #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hollis, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Sharon Mos, #3 Exhibit A (Kirby Contract), #4 Exhibit B (Logan Contract), #5 Exhibit C (Azofeifa Contract), #6 Exhibit D (Marks Contract), #7 Exhibit E (Silva Contract), #8 Exhibit F (Beach Contract), #9 Exhibit G (Frohman Contract))(Archer, T.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Dioli Azofeifa, Tonya Beach, David Frohman, Frances Kirby, Audrey Logan, Wanda Silva. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Doss, Jason)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Doss on behalf of Dioli Azofeifa, Tonya Beach, David Frohman, Frances Kirby, Audrey Logan, Wanda Silva (Doss, Jason)
May 17, 2019 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate, Cerulean Companies, Inc. and Anthem Holding Corporation for Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate, Cerulean Companies, Inc. and Anthem Holding Corporation for Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (eop)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8663683) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B - Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit -C - State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: James L. Hollis
Represented By: T. Joshua Archer
Represented By: Allison M. Ryan
Represented By: Briana Black
Represented By: E. Desmond Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Beach
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Frohman
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Logan
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dioli Azofeifa
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Kirby
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Silva
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Marks
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?