Livesafe, Inc. v. Livesafe Resources, Inc.

Plaintiff: Livesafe, Inc.
Defendant: Livesafe Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02248
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00868. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 16, 2019 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Georgia. Original file, transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED that this Action shall be transferred from the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 05/16/2019. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION and CONSENT ORDER Regarding Transfer of Venue by Livesafe, Inc.. (Menker, James) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/4/2019, before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2019.(thomson, anneliese) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion for Discovery [Dkt. No. 18] be and is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Dkt. No. 12] be and is HELD IN ABEYANCE until jurisdictional discovery has been completed. If, at that time, defendant's Motion to Dismiss is granted, plaintiff will be ordered to reimburse defendant for its attorney's fees and costs incurred in conducting additional unnecessary discovery. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/4/19. (yguy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 1/4/2019. Appearances of counsel. Court advised of case status. Deft's #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is argued and HELD IN ABEYANCE. Pltf's #18 MOTION for Discovery is GRANTED. (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion to Continue and Schedule Hearings [Dkt. No. 23] be and is DENIED. The Court will hear argument for both defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 12] and plaintiffs Motion for Discovery [Dkt. No. 18] on Friday, January 4,2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/02/2019. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Continue and Schedule Hearings by Livesafe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Menker, James) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 22 Opposition to #18 MOTION for Discovery filed by Livesafe Resources, Inc.. (Pennington, Edward) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan S. Hilbert and Certification of Local Counsel James R. Menker. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/28/2018. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Livesafe Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tracey Atwater)(Pennington, Edward) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan S. Hilbert and Certification of Local Counsel James R. Menker Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6422442. by Livesafe, Inc.. (Menker, James) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Notice of Correction re #18 MOTION for Discovery The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (clar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION for Discovery filed by Livesafe, Inc.. (Menker, James) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Discovery by Livesafe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Menker, James) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 Opposition to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Livesafe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Menker, James) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 16 Notice of Hearing Date re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Pennington, Edward) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Notice of Correction re #15 Notice of Hearing Date. The filing user has been notified that motions will not be heard on (12/28/18) and has been instructed to renotice the motion. (clar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 12/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (Attorney has been notified to file an Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion - The Court is not hearing motions on December 28, 2018 due to the Holidays - Deadlines Terminated (clar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date set for 12/28/2018 re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Pennington, Edward) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Livesafe Resources, Inc.. (Pennington, Edward) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Livesafe Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tracey B. Atwater, #2 Affidavit of Edward A. Pennington)(Pennington, Edward) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Livesafe Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pennington, Edward) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Darlene Kao Tzou on behalf of Livesafe Resources, Inc. (Tzou, Darlene) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Alan Pennington on behalf of Livesafe Resources, Inc. (Pennington, Edward) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion Regarding Waiver Of Service Of Summons And Complaint And For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/07/2018. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 Response to #6 Order to Show Cause filed by Livesafe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Menker, James) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION Regarding Waiver Of Service Of Summons And Complaint And For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint by Livesafe, Inc.. (Menker, James) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days the plaintiff show cause, if any, why this civil action should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/24/2018. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Livesafe Resources, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Livesafe, Inc.. (Menker, James) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Livesafe, Inc.. (Menker, James) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 4,552,833. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Livesafe Resources, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6176692) filed by Livesafe, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 5/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livesafe, Inc. v. Livesafe Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livesafe Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Edward A. Pennington
Represented By: Darlene Kao Tzou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Livesafe, Inc.
Represented By: James Robert Menker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?