Lopez v. Cissna et al
Plaintiff: Hector Anibal Jaimes Lopez
Defendant: Kevin Riddle and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2019cv02456
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Jean-Paul Boulee
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
July 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to AUSA Samuel Williams re #6 Order. (ddm)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation and Joint Motion to Remand #5 . This action is remanded to the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services which is ordered to issue a decision in this matter within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 7/8/19. (ddm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Remand Jurisdiction by L. Francis Cissna. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel)
June 18, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-2456-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (bnp)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II (J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 06/3/2019. (aaq)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna and Kevin Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kevin Riddle)(rlb)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hector Anibal Jaimes Lopez by Hector Anibal Jaimes Lopez.(rlb)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR DE NOVO NATURALIZATION HEARING UNDER 8 U.S.C. 1447(b) filed by Hector Anibal Jaimes Lopez. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8693000) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- N-400 Receipt Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 Naturalization Interview Results, #3 Exhibit 3 Letter from A. Drew Ferguson, #4 Exhibit 4 Letter from Lynn A. Westmoreland, #5 Exhibit 5 Letter from Jaime M. Ruvalcaba, #6 Exhibit 6 Letter from D. Michele Parker, #7 Exhibit 7 Letter from Susan Paula Kunig, #8 Exhibit 8 Letter from John Karafanda, #9 Exhibit 9 Letter from Alan J. Paluska, #10 Exhibit 10 Letter from Richard Fair, #11 Exhibit 11 Letter from John and Allyson Griffies, #12 Exhibit 12 Letter from Gary Russel Gore, #13 Exhibit 13 Letter from William Paul Smith, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 5/30/2019 to edit text (rlb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Cissna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Anibal Jaimes Lopez
Represented By: Rebeca Ellen Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?