9252-8595 Quebec, Inc. et al v. Rhode Island Textile Company
Plaintiff: 9252-8595 Quebec, Inc. and 9199-4467 Quebec, Inc.
Defendant: Rhode Island Textile Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02572
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant, Rhode Island Textile Company d/b/a Westminster Pet Products, Inc. may have until August 5, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/30/19. (rlb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint by 9199-4467 Quebec, Inc., 9252-8595 Quebec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VanderBroek, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Rhode Island Textile Company Answer due 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/3/19. (bnw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by 9199-4467 Quebec, Inc., 9252-8595 Quebec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VanderBroek, Mark)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by 9252-8595 Quebec, Inc., 9199-4467 Quebec, Inc.. Rhode Island Textile Company served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (VanderBroek, Mark)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bnw)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 6/7/19. (bnw)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED AO 120 . (VanderBroek, Mark)
June 6, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rhode Island Textile Company. (eop)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by 9252-8595 Quebec, Inc. and 9199-4467 Quebec, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8706017) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 9252-8595 Quebec, Inc. et al v. Rhode Island Textile Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Textile Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 9252-8595 Quebec, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Stephen VanderBroek
Represented By: Shaniqua L. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 9199-4467 Quebec, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Stephen VanderBroek
Represented By: Shaniqua L. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?