National Casualty Company v. Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC
Plaintiff: National Casualty Company
Defendant: Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02597
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Clarence Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by National Casualty Company.(Smith, Chandler)
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 Initial Disclosures by National Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment C)(Smith, Chandler)
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC.(Davis, Taylor)
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC to National Casualty Company's Second Amended Complaint by Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC.(Bertschi, Scott) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC filed by National Casualty Company.(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #15 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to file Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Dkt. 15-1) as of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/30/19. (jta)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by National Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint)(McMickle, Scott)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC's Initial Disclosure Statement by Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC.(Bertschi, Scott)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING re: #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: This case is assigned to an eight-month discovery track. Discovery shall be completed on or before April 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/4/19. (jta)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Clarence Cooper recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-2597-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 9/4/19. (jta)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by National Casualty Company. (Smith, Chandler)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Casualty Company by National Casualty Company.(Smith, Chandler)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sedgwick Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Sedgwick L.P., Corporate Parent Lightning Cayman Merger Sub, Ltd. for Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC. (Davis, Taylor)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC. Discovery ends on 12/27/2019.(Davis, Taylor) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by National Casualty Company. Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (McMickle, Scott)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC filed by National Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McMickle, Scott) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint that properly alleges the citizenship of Cunningham Lindsey by Monday, July 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 7/1/19. (jta)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by National Casualty Company. Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (McMickle, Scott)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC. (tcc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by National Casualty Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8711410) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Casualty Company v. Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Casualty Company
Represented By: Scott W. McMickle
Represented By: Chandler L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC
Represented By: Taylor Layne Davis
Represented By: Scott Fain Bertschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?