Georgia Automobile Dealers' Association v.General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Georgia Automobile Dealers' Association
Defendant: General Motors and General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02599
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission of Jason T Allen Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/14/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tcc)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission of Richard N Sox, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/14/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tcc)
June 14, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason T Allen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8717994). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Jason T. Allen added appearing on behalf of Georgia Automobile Dealers' Association (pmb)
June 14, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard N Sox, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-8717677). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Richard N. Sox added appearing on behalf of Georgia Automobile Dealers' Association (pmb)
June 13, 2019 Refund in the amount of $150.00 has been processed, effective 6/13/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
June 12, 2019 Clerks Approval re #6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-8717677. (Tyson, Bryan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason T Allen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8717994). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Georgia Automobile Dealers' Association. (Tyson, Bryan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard N Sox, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-8717677). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Georgia Automobile Dealers' Association. (Tyson, Bryan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Georgia Automobile Dealers' Association. (Tyson, Bryan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to General Motors. (tcc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Georgia Automobile Dealers' Association. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8711550) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgia Automobile Dealers' Association v.General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Automobile Dealers' Association
Represented By: Richard N. Sox
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Jason T. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Helm
Represented By: Christopher Shaun Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?