Mercadel v. Allied Interstate, LLC
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Mercadel
Defendant: Allied Interstate, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02641
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Clarence Cooper
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jacqueline Mercadel re #7 Order,, Set Submission Deadline. (dob)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing parties to file their portions of a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, and Plaintiff to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and CorporateDisclosure Statement, within fourteen (14) days after the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/6/2019. (dob)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied Interstate, LLC identifying Corporate Parent iQor US Inc. for Allied Interstate, LLC. (Fiorilla, Louis)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 COMPLAINT by Allied Interstate, LLC. Discovery ends on 12/2/2019.(Fiorilla, Louis) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Disclosures by Jacqueline Mercadel.(tcc)
June 28, 2019 USM 285 (incomplete, no service address provided) and summons received from plaintiff. (tcc)
June 13, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jacqueline Mercadel re #2 Order with forms.(dob)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Jacqueline Mercadel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall proceed as any other civil action, and Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without prepayment of a filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form, and to return to the Clerk of Court one of each for each Defendant named in the complaint within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply. Upon receipt of the forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a service waiver package for each Defendant. The Clerk is DIRECTED to complete the lower portion of the Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver form and to mail a service waiver package to each Defendant. In the event that any Defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within thirty-five (35) days following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshals Service a service package for that Defendant. the U.S. Marshals Service is DIRECTED to personally serve the Defendant. The executed waiver form or the completed USM 285 form shall be filed with the Clerk. Plaintiff is also ORDERED to keep the Court and Defendants advised of Plaintiff=s current address and telephone number at all times during the pendency of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 6/13/2019. (dob)
June 12, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Jacqueline Mercadel. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercadel v. Allied Interstate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Mercadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Interstate, LLC
Represented By: Louis G. Fiorilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?