Solus v. Regions Bank et al
Plaintiff: Chyna F. Solus
Defendant: Experian Information Services, Inc., Trans Union LLC, Bell & Williams Associates, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC and Regions Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv02650
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Clarence Cooper
Referring Judge: John K Larkins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Chyna F. Solus. Experian Information Services, Inc. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Webb, Orion)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chyna F. Solus. Regions Bank waiver mailed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Webb, Orion)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chyna F. Solus. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver mailed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Webb, Orion)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chyna F. Solus. Trans Union LLC waiver mailed on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Webb, Orion)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bell & Williams Associates, Inc.. (eop)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC. (eop)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Services, Inc.. (eop)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (eop)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Regions Bank. (eop)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Chyna F. Solus. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8720443) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solus v. Regions Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell & Williams Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chyna F. Solus
Represented By: Orion Gregory Webb
Represented By: Miranda Noel Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?