The Estate of Maxine Lovingood et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al

Plaintiff: The State of Georgia, The Estate of Maxine Lovingood and The Warren Lovingood Estate
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Georgia Department of Business Oversight and Georgia Secretary of State
Petitioner: Warren Lovingood
Case Number: 1:2019cv02663
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re #4 Leave of Absence. Leave of Absence for Arthur Ebbs, for the period of July 1st to 12th and July 25th to 26th, 2019, is APPROVED, but only as to court appearances in this case before the undersigned U.S. Magistrate Judge. The leave of absence is not applicable to any court appearances in this case before the District Court, as to which leave of absence must be separately applied for and obtained. Nor does the leave of absence cover any other deadlines or filings in this case required by or imposed by court order, local rule, operation of law, statute, applicable rule of procedure, or agreement of counsel. Those deadlines or requirements shall remain in full force and effect during any excused absence at court appearances. Approved by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 06/19/2019. (cmb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7-1-2019 through 7-12-2019, 7-25-2019 through 7-26-2019, by Arthur Allen Ebbs. (Ebbs, Arthur)
June 18, 2019 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Security Deed, #3 Exhibit Deed under Power)(Ebbs, Arthur)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo and Company, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Ebbs, Arthur)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8722821) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - State Court Filings, #2 Notice of Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Maxine Lovingood et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Maxine Lovingood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Warren Lovingood Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Arthur Allen Ebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Business Oversight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Warren Lovingood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?