Stabb v. Cobb County Magistrate Courts et al
Plaintiff: Linda Stabb
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Freddie Mac, Cobb County Magistrates Court and Federal Housing Finance Agency
Case Number: 1:2019cv02675
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address for Linda Stabb. (dgr)
July 30, 2019 Submission of #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (tcc)
July 26, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Linda Stabb re #10 Order. (bdb)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay Certain Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines. The parties' deadline to conduct the Rule 26(f) Early Planning Conference is EXTENDED until 16 days after the District Judge's final ruling on the last of the three pending motions to dismiss. The deadline to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan is EXTENDED until 14 days after the parties hold the Rule 26(f) conference. The discovery period shall commence on the date of the District Judge's final order on the last of the three currently pending motions to dismiss and shall expire four months thereafter. the Clerk is DIRECTED to update Plaintiff's address on the docket to 79 Gold Creek Court, Dawsonville, GA 30534, and to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at this Dawsonville address. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a notice on the docket in this Court within fourteen (14) days after the date of this Order stating her telephone number and confirming her current address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 7/26/2019. (bdb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Stay Certain Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines with Brief In Support by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Franklin, Kenneth)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Adelman on behalf of Cobb County Magistrates Court (Adelman, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh William Rowling, Jr on behalf of Cobb County Magistrates Court (Rowling, Hugh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Linda Stabb. (dgr)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Federal Housing Finance Agency re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice of Filing to Supplement Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Franklin, Kenneth)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Carl Pedigo on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Pedigo, Jason)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Federal Housing Finance Agency's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Franklin, Kenneth)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Replace Exhibit A to #1 Notice of Removal by Federal Housing Finance Agency (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court File)(Franklin, Kenneth)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8724012) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stabb v. Cobb County Magistrate Courts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jason Carl Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddie Mac
Represented By: Jason Carl Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County Magistrates Court
Represented By: Hugh William Rowling, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Alan Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Represented By: Kenneth Bradley Franklin
Represented By: Rebecca McLemore Lamberth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Stabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?