Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC v. eBizWare Inc.

Plaintiff: Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC
Defendant: eBizWare Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02740
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Jean-Paul Boulee
Referring Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #5 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, through August 9, 2019, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 7/17/19. (ddm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ddm)
July 17, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
July 17, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ddm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC (Dureska, Geoffrey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pleading in Response to Plaintif's Complaint by eBizWare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grant, Thomas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. eBizWare Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Dureska, Geoffrey) Modified on 7/3/2019 to edit dates (ddm).
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bdb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to eBizWare Inc. (bdb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT with Jury Demand filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8732568) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC v. eBizWare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC
Represented By: Louis M. Heidelberger
Represented By: David Ludwig
Represented By: Geoffrey Michael Dureska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBizWare Inc.
Represented By: Thomas C. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?