Tarharka v. Netz Manor LLC
Plaintiff: Jonathan Tarharka
Defendant: Netz Manor LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02748
Filed: June 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Submission of #3 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service attached with Brief In Support by Netz Manor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of motion)(Dukes, Robert)
June 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Netz Manor LLC. Discovery ends on 11/13/2019.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Netz Manor LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8731152) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - Statement of Claim, #2 Exhibit -B -Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2019 to correct filed date (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarharka v. Netz Manor LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Tarharka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netz Manor LLC
Represented By: Robert Maceo Ayorinde Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?