Reid v. HSBC Bank, USA, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Reid
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and HSBC Bank, USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02888
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Manuel Reid re #7 Order to Show Cause. (tcc)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS why Defendant's motion should not be granted and the case dismissed. Plaintiff is cautioned that the undersigned will recommend dismissal for want of prosecution if he does not comply with this Order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (b); LR 41.3(A)(2)/ NDGa. ("The Court may/ with or without notice to the parties, dismiss a civil case for want of prosecution if... [a] plaintiff... shall, after notice,... fail or refuse to obey a lawful order of the Court.... /"). The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned after FOURTEEN (14) DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/23/2019. (tcc)
August 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Manuel Reid re #6 Order on Motion to Stay. (tcc)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - This matter is before the Court for consideration of Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc's motion for a stay of pretrial deadlines and discovery pending a ruling on its motion to dismiss. (Doc. #5 ). Plaintiff and Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. are each ORDERED to file a CIP within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS. To the extent that the motion requests a stay of discovery, the motion is DENIED AS MOOT. The motion is otherwise GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/23/2019. (tcc)
August 22, 2019 Submission of #5 MOTION to Stay Certain Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines, #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (tcc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Certain Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines by HSBC Bank, USA, N.A., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (McGinnis, Shanon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by HSBC Bank, USA, N.A., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(McGinnis, Shanon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Manuel Reid. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (tcc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (bnw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Manuel Reid. (Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100113581) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. HSBC Bank, USA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Shanon J. McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank, USA, N.A.
Represented By: Shanon J. McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?