Verint Americas Inc. v. The Regents of the University of Michigan
Plaintiff: Verint Americas Inc.
Defendant: The Regents of the University of Michigan
Case Number: 1:2019cv02892
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Jean-Paul Boulee
Referring Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Chittam Udayan Thakore on behalf of The Regents of the University of Michigan (Thakore, Chittam)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard William Miller on behalf of The Regents of the University of Michigan (Miller, Richard)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Brief In Support by The Regents of the University of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(Nodine, Lawrence)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, through August 13, 2019, to respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 7/24/19. (ddm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by The Regents of the University of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nodine, Lawrence)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Verint Americas Inc.. The Regents of the University of Michigan served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Schaetzel, Stephen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ddm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Schaetzel, Stephen)
June 26, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (bnw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Regents of the University of Michigan. (bnw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Verint Americas Inc.(Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8753070) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/26/2019 (bnw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verint Americas Inc. v. The Regents of the University of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verint Americas Inc.
Represented By: Robert James Leonard
Represented By: Stephen M. Schaetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Regents of the University of Michigan
Represented By: Lawrence K. Nodine
Represented By: Richard William Miller
Represented By: Dennis Alan White, Jr.
Represented By: Chittam Udayan Thakore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?