J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Lee
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Grace K. Lee and Cru Urban Lounge
Case Number: 1:2019cv02932
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Grace K. Lee. (Fitzpatrick, Nathan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 Initial Disclosures by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment C, #3 Attachment D)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E")(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Grace K. Lee filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc..(Reemsnyder, Ronald) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Grace K. Lee served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing on #5 Motion for Summary Judgment for Friday, September 20, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M Ray II. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 8/2/19. (rlb)
August 2, 2019 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Grace K. Lee. (Fitzpatrick, Nathan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Disclosures by Grace K. Lee.(Fitzpatrick, Nathan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Grace K. Lee. Discovery ends on 12/30/2019.(Fitzpatrick, Nathan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Grace K. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzpatrick, Nathan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Grace K. Lee served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Grace K. Lee. (bnw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (bnw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8756658) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace K. Lee
Represented By: Nathan Edward Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cru Urban Lounge
Represented By: Nathan Edward Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?