Futch v. D.M.D.; LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Futch
Defendant: D.M.D., LLC and DB Real Estate Assets I LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02953
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Thomas H. Futch. DB Real Estate Assets I LLC served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Ehrlich, Craig)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to DB Real Estate Assets I LLC. (tcc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Thomas H. Futch as to Defendant DB Real Estate Assets I LLC (Ehrlich, Craig)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against DB Real Estate Assets I LLC filed by Thomas H. Futch.(Ehrlich, Craig) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/31/19. (bnw)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Thomas H. Futch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Craig)
July 23, 2019 Clerk's Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons: OK, per TWT. (cmd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Thomas H. Futch. (Ehrlich, Craig)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Thomas H. Futch. D.M.D., LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Ehrlich, Craig)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to D.M.D., LLC. (tmf)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Thomas H. Futch. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8759746) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Futch v. D.M.D.; LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.M.D., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Real Estate Assets I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Futch
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?