Taylor v. Kuchar
Plaintiff: Lou M. Taylor
Defendant: Bryan S. Kuchar
Case Number: 1:2019cv03028
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:8131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #32 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs associated the the dismissal of these claims. (bjh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Lou M. Taylor. (Sperry, Marcy)
March 9, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (bjh)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The parties have announced that this case has settled. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The parties shall file a dismissal or other filing disposing of this case upon finalization of the settlement. If settlement negotiations fail, the parties shall promptly move to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/9/20. (bjh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Settlement by Lou M. Taylor (Sperry, Marcy)
February 6, 2020 Filing 29 Second NOTICE to Take Deposition of LOU M. TAYLOR filed by Bryan S. Kuchar (Heitner, Darren)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. Plaintiff Lou M. Taylor sued Defendant Bryan S. Kuchar in the Northern District of Georgia. (Dkt. #1 .) Defendant seeks to depose Plaintiff in Atlanta, Georgia. (Dkt. #24 .) Plaintiff wants to be deposed where she lives, Los Angeles, California, or to have the deposition taken via videoconference. (Dkt. #27 .) Since Plaintiff chose to sue in the Northern District of Georgia, she cannot now refuse her deposition being taken in this district. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to appear in this district before the close of discovery, February 28, 2020, to be deposed. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/5/2020. (bgt)
January 31, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE Of Filing Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute by Lou M. Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Statement Exhibits)(Sperry, Marcy)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting Defendant's #26 Motion for Extension of Time, up to and including 2/28/2020, to complete discovery. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/29/2020. (bgt)
January 28, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Bryan S. Kuchar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Heitner, Darren)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) denying Plaintiff's #25 Motion for Protective Order as a violation of Section (l) of the Court's Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation, which provides that "[m]otions to compel... ordinarily may NOT be filed without a prior conference with the Court." (Dkt. #3 at 6.) The parties should follow the discovery dispute process outlined in the Standing Order, which begins with the filing of a Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/28/2020. (bgt)
January 27, 2020 Filing 25 First MOTION for Protective Order for Remote Deposition with Brief In Support by Lou M. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Memorandum Exhibits)(Aron, Alexandria)
January 17, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lou M. Taylor filed by Bryan S. Kuchar (Rayasam, Ravindra)
January 13, 2020 Filing 23 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bryan S. Kuchar filed by Lou M. Taylor (Sperry, Marcy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Bryan S. Kuchar.(Rayasam, Ravindra)
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bryan S. Kuchar filed by Lou M. Taylor (Sperry, Marcy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 20 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Alexandria Jane Aron and Marcy Lane Sperry replacing attorney Jordan A. Fishman and Hayden R. Pace. (Pace, Hayden)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Jane Aron on behalf of Lou M. Taylor (Aron, Alexandria)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcy Lane Sperry on behalf of Lou M. Taylor (Sperry, Marcy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving Discovery Requests by Lou M. Taylor.(Fishman, Jordan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 Initial Disclosures by Bryan S. Kuchar.(Rayasam, Ravindra)
October 31, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to attorney Darren A. Heitner re #15 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (bgt)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting attorney Darren Adam Heitner's #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bryan S. Kuchar. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/31/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step. (bgt)
October 31, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Darren Adam Heitner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9028800). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Darren A. Heitner added appearing on behalf of Bryan S. Kuchar (pmb)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Darren Adam Heitner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9028800). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Bryan S. Kuchar. (Rayasam, Ravindra)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Lou M. Taylor.(Pace, Hayden)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER approving #11 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to a four-month discovery track discovery shall be completed on or before 1/31/2020. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/4/19. (bjh)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Lou M. Taylor. (Pace, Hayden)
September 17, 2019 RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Darren Heitner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8927579). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Darren Heitner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8927579). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Bryan S. Kuchar. (Phillips, John)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only). Local Rule 5.1C requires that all "[p]leadings, motions, and other documents presented to the court for filing must... be prepared in one of the following fonts: Times New Roman (at least 14 point), Courier New (at least 12 point), Century Schoolbook (at least 13 point), or Book Antigua (at least 13 point)." Defendant's #9 Answer is written in 12 point, Times New Roman font. The Court notifies the parties that the Court may strike and not consider any future filings that do not comply with the format requirements of the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/30/2019. (bgt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant, BRYAN KUCHAR'S ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Bryan S. Kuchar. Discovery ends on 1/27/2020.(Phillips, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Lou M. Taylor. (Pace, Hayden)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Lou M. Taylor. Bryan S. Kuchar served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (bjh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 RE-FILED @ #7 DOCUMENT FILING ERROR-INCORRECT EVENTAFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons , as to Bryan S. Kuchar. (Pace, Hayden) Modified on 8/12/2019 (bjh).
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bryan S. Kuchar. (bjh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Lou M. Taylor (Pace, Hayden)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bryan S. Kuchar. (eop)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lou M. Taylor. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8766360) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Exhibit -3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Kuchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou M. Taylor
Represented By: Jordan A. Fishman
Represented By: Hayden R. Pace
Represented By: Marcy Lane Sperry
Represented By: Alexandria Jane Aron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan S. Kuchar
Represented By: John M. Phillips
Represented By: Ravindra Rayasam
Represented By: Darren A. Heitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?