United States of America v. $85,980.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $85,980.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Eugene Cooper
Case Number: 1:2019cv03030
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Rose Mary Parham Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8891670). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Eugene Cooper. (Rice, Richard)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 CLAIM Verified by Eugene Cooper. (Rice, Richard)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Rice, Jr on behalf of Eugene Cooper (Rice, Richard)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 08/21/2019. (Smith, Cynthia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Eric Hicks at Lynes Avenue, Savannah, Georgia Address (Smith, Cynthia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Eric Hicks via Coweta County Detention Center (Smith, Cynthia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Eric Hicks at 42 Street, Savannah, Georgia Address (Sneed, Sekret)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Curtis Leman Hicks (Sneed, Sekret)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Eugene Cooper (Sneed, Sekret)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Eric Hicks via Attorney Veselin Simonov (Sneed, Sekret)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Filing Complaint by United States of America Sent to Eugene Cooper via Attorney Rose Mary Parham (Sneed, Sekret)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed on 7/10/2019 for $85,980.00 in U.S. Currency. (rlb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Warrant for Arrest in Rem: $85,890.00 in United States Currency by United States of America (rlb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $85,980.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $85,980.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Beckwith Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eugene Cooper
Represented By: Richard A. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?