Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. Central Intelligence Agency
Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Case Number: 1:2019cv03054
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall be granted an extension of time to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint through and including November 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/28/2019. (rjs)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel) Modified on 8/28/2019 (rjs).
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Samuel Williams replacing attorney Flora Manship. (Williams, Samuel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. Central Intelligence Agency served on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service to Central Intelligence Agency, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney General, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Central Intelligence Agency shall have up to and including September 6, 2019, to file its responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/6/19. (jkl)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manship, Flora)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (bdb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Central Intelligence Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 U. S. Attorney's Office, #2 William P. Barr)(bdb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8771728) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Flora Manship
Represented By: Samuel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Stewart Hermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?