Fashion Value, LLC v. Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Fashion Value, LLC
Defendant: R.K. Commercial Contracting, Inc., John Doe Entity One, Bryan Blackman Company, LLC and Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03073
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Fashion Value, LLC. (Colvin, William)
August 22, 2019 Clerks Notation re #23 Certificate of Interested Persons /Corporate Disclosures by Bryan Blackman Company, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Persons by Bryan Blackman Company, LLC. (Neary, Brian)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 Initial Disclosures by Bryan Blackman Company, LLC.(Neary, Brian)
August 21, 2019 Clerks Notation re #21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fashion Value, LLC by Fashion Value, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fashion Value, LLC by Fashion Value, LLC. (Attachments: #1 cert service)(Colvin, William)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Motion to Dismiss, etc... re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Or For More Definite StatementMOTION for More Definite Statement , #4 MOTION to Dismiss Or For More Definite StatementMOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Fashion Value, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Cert service)(Colvin, William)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time through 8/20/19 for Plaintiff to file a response to the Co-Defendant's partial Motion to Dismiss or for more Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/20/19. (jpa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Motion to Dismiss, etc... re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Or For More Definite StatementMOTION for More Definite Statement by Fashion Value, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit "A", #2 cert. of service)(Colvin, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 Initial Disclosures by R.K. Commercial Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Witness list, #2 Expert designation, #3 Document list, #4 Insurance Agreement)(Grozine, Abby)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #15 Stipulation filed by Fashion Value, LLC (Ward, Alex)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extend Time to Respond Motion to Dismiss by Fashion Value, LLC. (Ward, Alex)
August 9, 2019 Submission of #4 MOTION to Dismiss Or For More Definite Statement, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER LIFTING the previously imposed STAY, and this case is now ready to proceed. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/6/19. (jpa)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Of Filing Amended Notice and Petition for Removal by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silverman, Katherine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Crossclaim, by Bryan Blackman Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Verification)(Winters, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bryan Blackman Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Verification)(Winters, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bryan Blackman Company, LLC. (Winters, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Crossclaim by Bryan Blackman Company, LLC.(Winters, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand Plaintiff's Complaint by Bryan Blackman Company, LLC.(Winters, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Accordingly, before this case proceeds any further, the Court ORDERS Defendants to file a notice indicating the citizenship of the members of the LLC Plaintiff and Defendant, within twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this order. See 28 U.S.C. 1653. The Court STAYS this case as to all Parties. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to resubmit this action to the undersigned after twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/18/19. (bnw)
July 17, 2019 Clerks Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by R.K. Commercial Contracting, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by R.K. Commercial Contracting, Inc.. (Grozine, Abby)
July 15, 2019 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Stores, Inc., Corporate Parent Burlington Coast Factory Investments Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Burlington Coat Factory Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Burlington Holdings, LLC for Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
July 11, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Or For More Definite StatementMOTION for More Definite Statement. Two part motion filed as one. Added Motion for more Definite Statement. (jpa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Stores, Inc., Corporate Parent Burlington Coast Factory Investments Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Burlington Coat Factory Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Burlington Holdings, LLC for Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Silverman, Katherine)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support)(Silverman, Katherine) . Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 7/11/2019 (jpa).
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand; and CROSSCLAIM against Bryan Blackman Company, LLC by R.K. Commercial Contracting, Inc.. ( Discovery ends on 12/2/2019.) (Filed 7/3/19 in Superior Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8773805) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fashion Value, LLC v. Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.K. Commercial Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Abby C. Grozine
Represented By: David Frank Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entity One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Blackman Company, LLC
Represented By: Brian Robert Neary
Represented By: Robert Ray Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Merriam Silverman
Represented By: Charles Hale Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fashion Value, LLC
Represented By: William L. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?