Yancey v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Arturo Yancey
Defendant: John Doe
Petitioner: Michael Crews
Case Number: 1:2019cv03085
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Marked: Return to sender, vacant, unable to forward. Mail sent to Michael Crews re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tmf)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Marked: Return to sender, vacant, unable to forward. Mail sent to John Doe re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tmf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Marked: Return to sender, vacant, unable to forward. Sent to Michael Crews re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (tmf) (tmf) Modified on 7/25/2019 to correct filing date(tmf).
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Marked: Return to sender, vacant, unable to forward. Sent to John Doe re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (tmf)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Documents remanded pursuant to #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation to Magistrate Court of De Kalb County, status: accepted. (tmf)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Documents remanded pursuant to #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation to Magistrate Court of De Kalb County, status: submitted. (tmf)
July 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Crews, John Doe, Arturo Yancey re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tmf)
July 12, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER accepting #3 Final Report and Recommendation: The Clerk is DIRECTED to remand this case to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County, Georgia and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/12/2019. (tmf)
July 12, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Crews, John Doe, Arturo Yancey re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (tmf)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/12/2019. (tmf)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on at #3 by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/12/2019. (tmf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal: It is RECOMMENDED that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this reference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/12/2019. (tmf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Michael Crews. (Attachments: #1 Petition for removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 9, 2019 Submission of the #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (aaq)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Movant Michael Crews. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Petition for Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yancey v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?