Visible Connections, LLC v. Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Visible Connections, LLC
Defendant: Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03148
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended only until September 16, 2019. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/3/2019. (pdw)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Visible Connections, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Zoom Video Communications, Inc.'s Answer due 9/4/2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/6/19. (jkl)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Jennifer Tatum Lee's #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/6/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Cabrach John Connor's #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/6/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendant, filed by Visible Connections, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel)
July 30, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Tatum Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8813908). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Jennifer Tatum Lee added appearing on behalf of Visible Connections, LLC (pmb)
July 30, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Cabrach John Connor Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8813897). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Cabrach J. Connor added appearing on behalf of Visible Connections, LLC (pmb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Tatum Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8813908). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Visible Connections, LLC. (Kent, Daniel)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Cabrach John Connor Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8813897). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Visible Connections, LLC. (Kent, Daniel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Visible Connections, LLC. (eop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Zoom Video Communications, Inc.. (eop)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Visible Connections, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8784072) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -US Pat #6,665,392, #2 Exhibit -B - US Pat #7,284,203, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Visible Connections, LLC v. Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Visible Connections, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Jennifer Tatum Lee
Represented By: Cabrach J. Connor
Represented By: Kevin Sean Kudlac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?