Leal-Delgado v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Neira Josefina Leal-Delgado
Defendant: Denise Frazier, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Christopher Wray and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv03174
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
August 21, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (tmf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Neira Josefina Leal-Delgado (Cohen, Marshall)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 07/23/19. (aaq)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Neira Josefina Leal-Delgado. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Denise Frazier served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Kevin K. McAleenan served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Christopher Wray served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cuccinelli - executed summons, #2 Summons Wray - executed summons, #3 Summons Frazier - executed summons, #4 Summons Barr - executed summons, #5 Summons Pak - executed summons)(Cohen, Marshall)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Byung K. Pak. (eop)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to William Barr. (eop)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Denise Frazier. (eop)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Christopher Wray. (eop)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (eop)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kevin K. McAleenan. (eop)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MARSHALL LEWIS COHEN on behalf of Neira Josefina Leal-Delgado (eop)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Neira Josefina Leal-Delgado. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8787970) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - Receipt Notice, #2 Exhibit -B - Form N-652, #3 Exhibit -C - Hand Delivered Receipt, #4 Exhibit -D -Infopass, #5 Exhibit -E - Notice of Continuance, #6 Exhibit -F - Response to Notice of Continuance, #7 Exhibit -G - Case Status Information, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leal-Delgado v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neira Josefina Leal-Delgado
Represented By: Marshall Lewis Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?