FireNet Technologies, LLC v. Citrix Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: FireNet Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Citrix Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03199
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Citrix Systems, Inc. Answer due 9/16/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/12/2019. (tmf)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, for Defendant, filed by FireNet Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by FireNet Technologies, LLC. Citrix Systems, Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Kent, Daniel)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to APPLICATION for Admission of Hanna Glomska Cohen. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 07/30/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rvb)
July 26, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Hanna Glomska Cohen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8810305). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Hanna Glomska Cohen added appearing on behalf of FireNet Technologies, LLC (pmb)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Andrey Belenky. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 07/24/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rvb)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Dmitry Kheyfits. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 07/24/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rvb)
July 24, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrey Belenky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803727). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Andrey Belenky added appearing on behalf of FireNet Technologies, LLC (pmb)
July 24, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Dmitry Kheyfits Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803711). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Dmitry Kheyfits added appearing on behalf of FireNet Technologies, LLC (pmb)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 07/23/19. (aaq)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Hanna Glomska Cohen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8810305). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by FireNet Technologies, LLC. (Kent, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Citrix Systems, Inc.. (eop)
July 19, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrey Belenky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803727). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by FireNet Technologies, LLC. (Kent, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Dmitry Kheyfits Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8803711). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by FireNet Technologies, LLC. (Kent, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FireNet Technologies, LLC identifying Other Affiliate, Intelleq Holdings, LLC for FireNet Technologies, LLC.(eop)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by FireNet Technologies, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8790999) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -US Pat 6,317,837, #2 Exhibit -B -US Pat 7,739,302, #3 Exhibit -C -US Pat 8,306,994, #4 Exhibit -D -US Pat 8,892,600, #5 Exhibit -E - NetScaler 12.0, #6 Exhibit -F -Citrix NetScaler Gateway, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FireNet Technologies, LLC v. Citrix Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrix Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FireNet Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Hanna Glomska Cohen
Represented By: Andrey Belenky
Represented By: Dmitry Kheyfits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?