Zayo Group, LLC v. American Shoring, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zayo Group, LLC
Defendant: American Shoring, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03208
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 10 2019, October 11 2019, October 12 2019, October 13 2019, October 14 2019, October 15 2019, October 16 2019, October 17 2019, October 18 2019, October 19 2019, October 20 2019, October 21 2019, October 22 2019, October 24 2019, October 25 2019, October 26 2019, October 27 2019, October 28 2019, October 29 2019, November 27 2019, November 28 2019, November 29 2019, November 30 2019, December 1 2019, December 2 2019, December 3 2019, December 4 2019, February 7 2020, April 2 2020, April 3 2020, April 4 2020, April 5 2020, April 6 2020, April 7 2020, June 3 2020, June 4 2020, June 5 2020, June 6 2020, June 7 2020, June 8 2020, June 9 2020, by William Terrence Casey, Jr. (Casey, William)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The six-month discovery deadline is March 2, 2020. Any motions to amend the pleadings must have obtained prior permission of the court to file any motion to amend. Any Motions for Summary Judgment must be filed by April 2, 2020, and if no Motions for Summary Judgment are filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due on April 2, 2020. The Clerk is directed to submit this action on April 3, 2020, if the parties have not filed a Motion for Summary Judgment or Proposed Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/6/2019. (rjs)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Zayo Group, LLC. (Ketchum, Daniel)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Disclosures by American Shoring, Inc..(Jenkins, Marvis)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Shoring, Inc. by American Shoring, Inc..(Casey, William)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zayo Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Zayo Group Holdings, Inc. for Zayo Group, LLC by Zayo Group, LLC.(Ketchum, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant American Shoring, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by American Shoring, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/2/2020.(Casey, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Zayo Group, LLC. American Shoring, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Ketchum, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to American Shoring, Inc.. (eop)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Zayo Group, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8793688) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zayo Group, LLC v. American Shoring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zayo Group, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Jorgenson
Represented By: Daniel R. Ketchum, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Shoring, Inc.
Represented By: William Terrence Casey, Jr.
Represented By: Marvis Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?