Lamonte v. City of Hampton, Georgia
Plaintiff: Danny Lamonte
Defendant: City of Hampton, Georgia
Case Number: 1:2019cv03227
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Danny Lamonte. City of Hampton, Georgia served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Durham, James)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Colleen O'Reilly on behalf of Danny Lamonte (O'Reilly, Shannon)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to City of Hampton, Georgia. (eop)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Danny Lamonte. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8797232) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -EEOC Dismissal, #2 Exhibit -B -Antem Litem Notice, #3 Exhibit -C -Returned Green Card, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamonte v. City of Hampton, Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lamonte
Represented By: James D. Durham
Represented By: Shannon Colleen O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton, Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?