Ikomoin v. U.S. Bank National Association
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Appellant: Anthony Ikomoin
Trustee: Mary Ida Townson
Case Number: 1:2019cv03244
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellant's Brief due by 9/16/2019. (jpa)
August 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Ikomoin re #5 Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule. (jpa)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Doc1, #2 Doc3, #3 Doc4, #4 Doc5, #5 Doc6, #6 Doc7, #7 Doc12, #8 Doc13, #9 Doc14, #10 Doc15, #11 Doc17, #12 Doc22, #13 Doc23, #14 Doc24, #15 Doc36, #16 Doc37, #17 Doc38, #18 Docket Sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)
August 5, 2019 Receipt of Appeal filing fee on 7/31/19 by Bankruptcy Court. Receipt Number 1257512. Fee amount of $298.00 paid by Anthony Ikomoin. (jpa)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Appellant to either pay the required appeal filing fee or submit an application to proceed ifp within 14 days. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/23/19. (jpa)
July 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Ikomoin re #3 Order. (jpa)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
July 19, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Anthony Ikomoin as to Anthony Ikomoin, Anthony Ikomoin regarding #2 Order. (mlb)
July 18, 2019 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross for IFP review. (tmf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Ikomoin, USBC Case#: 19-57205-bem. Notice of Appeal filed 07/16/2019 from Order entered 06/11/2019 by Appellant Anthony Ikomoin. Fee Paid: No. (Attachments: #1 NOA, #2 Order, #3 Docket Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ikomoin v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Anthony Ikomoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Mary Ida Townson
Represented By: Mary Ida Townson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?