Mize et al v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Daniel Gregg and James Derek Mize
Defendant: The U.S. Department of State and Michael R. Pompeo
Case Number: 1:2019cv03331
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize on the United States Attorney for the Northern District of Georgia (Polito, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize on the Secretary of State of the United States (Polito, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize on the Department of State (Polito, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize on the Attorney General of the United States (Polito, John)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Eleanor Pelta. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/6/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Christie P. Bahna. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/6/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to John A. Polito. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/5/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Susan Baker Manning. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/5/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Jacquelynne M Hamilton. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/5/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
August 5, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Christie P. Bahna Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-8838228). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Tara L. Borelli added appearing on behalf of Jonathan Daniel Gregg and James Derek Mize (jkm)
August 5, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Eleanor Pelta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8838158). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Tara L. Borelli added appearing on behalf of Jonathan Daniel Gregg and James Derek Mize (jkm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Christie P. Bahna Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number GANDC-8838228). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Borelli, Tara)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Eleanor Pelta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8838158). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Borelli, Tara)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charis Redmond. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/2/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bjh)
August 2, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Charis Redmond Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8832520). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Tara L. Borelli added appearing on behalf of James Derek Mize (jkm)
August 2, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Charis Redmond re #19 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (bjh)
August 2, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Baker Manning Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8834418). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Tara L. Borelli added appearing on behalf of James Derek Mize (jkm)
August 2, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of John A. Polito Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8834363). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Tara L. Borelli added appearing on behalf of James Derek Mize (jkm)
August 2, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacquelynne M. Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8835866). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Tara L. Borelli added appearing on behalf of James Derek Mize et al (jkm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacquelynne M. Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8835866). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Borelli, Tara)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Baker Manning Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8834418). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Borelli, Tara)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of John A. Polito Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8834363). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Borelli, Tara)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Charis Redmond Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8832520). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Borelli, Tara)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Aaron Morris. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/31/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Karen L. Loewy. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/31/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Omar-Gonzalez-Pagan. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/31/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
July 31, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Omar Gonzalez-Pagan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8826395). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Omar Gonzalez-Pagan added appearing on behalf of Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize (cdg)
July 31, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Karen L. Loewy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8826356). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Karen Loewy added appearing on behalf of Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize (cdg)
July 31, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Aaron Morris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8828209). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Aaron Morris added appearing on behalf of Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize (cdg)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Aaron Morris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8828209). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Borelli, Tara)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Omar Gonzalez-Pagan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8826395). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Borelli, Tara)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Karen L. Loewy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8826356). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Borelli, Tara)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 REDACTION to #3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Borelli, Tara)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 REDACTION to #1 Complaint,, Exhibit A by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Passport Citizenship Unit - Redacted)(Borelli, Tara)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 REDACTION to #1 Complaint,, Civil Cover Sheet by Jonathan Daniel Gregg, James Derek Mize. (Borelli, Tara)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC Summons Issued as to Michael R. Pompeo and The U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Summons The U.S. Department of State)(aaq)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 ---PDF SEALED PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S #2 ORDER---Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Jonathan Daniel Gregg and James Derek Mize. (aaq) (aaq).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The Court ORDERS the Clerk to seal the documents filed on July 23, 2019, and redact the minors name on the docket to S.M. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to refile, on or before August 1, 2019, these documents with the minors full name redacted from the filings. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 07/23/19. (aaq)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 ---PDFs SEALED PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S #2 ORDER ---COMPLAINT filed by James Derek Mize and Jonathan Daniel Gregg. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8810735) (aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2019 and text edited: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover, #3 Summons Pompeo, #4 Summons Department of State) (aaq).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mize et al v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Daniel Gregg
Represented By: Tara L. Borelli
Represented By: John A. Polito
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Eleanor Pelta
Represented By: Christie P. Bahna
Represented By: Charis Redmond
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Aaron Curtis Morris
Represented By: Susan Baker Manning
Represented By: Jacquelynne M. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Derek Mize
Represented By: Tara L. Borelli
Represented By: John A. Polito
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Eleanor Pelta
Represented By: Christie P. Bahna
Represented By: Charis Redmond
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Aaron Curtis Morris
Represented By: Susan Baker Manning
Represented By: Jacquelynne M. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?