Huck et al v. Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Huck and Peggy Huck
Defendant: Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp. and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv03336
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-03336-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (bnp)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including September 24, 2019, to file a reply brief re #3 MOTION to Dismiss. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/5/19. (hfm)
September 5, 2019 Submission of #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint for Failure to State a Claim to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zachman, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Peggy Huck, Ronald Huck. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Slade, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Certificate of Compliance by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Zachman, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/23/2019 to edit text (bnp).
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Peggy Huck, Ronald Huck (Slade, David)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Peggy Huck, Ronald Huck (Bates, Joseph)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #8 and #9 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/21/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
August 21, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of David F. Slade Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8868509). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney David Slade added appearing on behalf of Peggy Huck, Ronald Huck (pmb)
August 21, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph H. Bates Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8868504). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Joseph H. Bates, III added appearing on behalf of Peggy Huck, Ronald Huck (pmb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of David F. Slade Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8868509). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Peggy Huck, Ronald Huck. (Cohen, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph H. Bates Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8868504). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Peggy Huck, Ronald Huck. (Cohen, David)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including August 27, 2019, to respond re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/8/19. (hfm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Compliance with Court's Standing Order by David Michael Cohen on behalf of Peggy Huck, Ronald Huck (Cohen, David)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint for Failure to State a Claim with Brief In Support by Peggy Huck, Ronald Huck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Cohen, David)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER by docket entry only granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/2/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
August 2, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of RICHARD L FENTON Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8831297). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Jeffrey Allen Zachman added appearing on behalf of Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp. (jkm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of RICHARD L FENTON Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8831297). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Zachman, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine and Nichido Fire Insurance Company, Ltd. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine and Nichido Fire Insurance Company, Ltd. for Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp.. (Zachman, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint for Failure to State a Claim with Brief In Support by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Zachman, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/31/2019 to edit event type (bnp).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/29/19. (bnp)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8811610) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeffrey Zachman, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration (Superior Court Action Pleadings), #3 Exhibit B to Declaration (6.25.19 Affidavit), #4 Exhibit C to Declaration (6.26.19 Affidavit), #5 Exhibit D to Declaration (PA SOS website), #6 Exhibit E to Declaration (PA SOS Website), #7 Exhibit F to Declaration (GA 2019 Tax Appraisal), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huck et al v. Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Huck
Represented By: David Slade
Represented By: David Michael Cohen
Represented By: David F. Slade
Represented By: Joseph H. Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Huck
Represented By: David Slade
Represented By: David Michael Cohen
Represented By: David F. Slade
Represented By: Joseph H. Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Zachman
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Zachman
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?