Hickey v. Total System Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cody Hickey
Defendant: Connie D. McDaniel, Sidney E. Harris, Joia M. Johnson, Richard A. Smith, F. Thaddeus Arroyo, John T. Turner, Total System Services, Inc., Kriss Cloninger, III, M. Troy Woods and Walter W. Driver, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03337
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Melissa Fortunato re #7 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (tmf)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Melissa A. Fortunato's Motion (Letter) to Withdraw as Attorney for Cody Hickey #6 . The Motion is unopposed and complies with the Court's instructions. Thus, upon consideration, the Motion #6 is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Melissa A. Fortunato as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/18/2019. (tmf)
September 17, 2019 Submission of #6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Richard A. Acocelli. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 08/30/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rvb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION (Letter) to Withdraw as Attorney for Cody Hickey as to counsel, Melissa A. Fortunato. (bdb)
August 27, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard A. Acocelli Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8879511). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Richard A. Acocelli, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Cody Hickey (pmb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard A. Acocelli Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8879511). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Cody Hickey. (Rogovin, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Richard A. Acocelli, Jr.. Clerk to follow-up by 8/23/2019. (pmb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Melissa A. Fortunato. Clerk to follow-up by 8/23/2019. (pmb)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/26/2019. (tmf)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Cody Hickey.(Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8812167) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickey v. Total System Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie D. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney E. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joia M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Thaddeus Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total System Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kriss Cloninger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Troy Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter W. Driver, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Hickey
Represented By: Michael A. Rogovin
Represented By: Richard A. Acocelli, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa A. Fortunato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?