Branch Banking and Trust Company v. LVB, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: Profiling Solutions, Inc., Ronald S. Fisher, LVB, LLC and Sara L. Van Beck
Case Number: 1:2019cv03402
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #5 Return of Service Executed, #7 Return of Service Executed, #6 Return of Service Executed, #8 Return of Service Executed. Dates served and Answer due dates has been edited to reflect PDF's. (dob)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. LVB, LLC served on 8/10/2019, answer due 8/31/2019. (Levy, Brian) Modified on 8/13/2019 to edit date served to reflect PDF (dob).
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. Sara L. Van Beck served on 8/10/2019, answer due 8/31/2019. (Levy, Brian) Modified on 8/13/2019 to edit date served to reflect PDF (dob).
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. Profiling Solutions, Inc. served on 8/10/2019, answer due 8/31/2019. (Levy, Brian) Modified on 8/13/2019 to edit date served to reflect PDF .(dob).
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. Ronald S. Fisher served on 8/10/2019, answer due 8/31/2019. (Levy, Brian) Modified on 8/13/2019 to edit date of service to reflect PDF (dob).
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Branch Banking and Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent BB&T for Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Levy, Brian)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ronald S. Fisher, LVB, LLC, Profiling Solutions, Inc., Sara L. Van Beck. (Attachments: #1 Summons Profiling Solutions, Inc., #2 Summons Ronald S. Fisher, #3 Summons Sara L. Van Beck)(tmf)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8822790) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B- Note Modification, #3 Exhibit C- Security Deed, #4 Exhibit D- Profiling Solutions Guaranty, #5 Exhibit E- Fisher Guaranty, #6 Exhibit F- Van Beck Guaranty, #7 Exhibit G- Notice of Default, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct text(tmf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. LVB, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Profiling Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVB, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara L. Van Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Paul G. Durdaller
Represented By: Brian Joel Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?