Long v. Cobb County School District
Plaintiff: Romonica Lynn Long
Defendant: Cobb County School District
Case Number: 1:2019cv03418
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Referring Judge: Janet F King
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cobb County School District. Cobb County School District waiver mailed on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Farmer, Randall)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Cobb County School District on 8/27/2019 with copy of complaint and order for service. If waiver not returned by 10/1/2019, prepare personal service package. (adg)
August 16, 2019 Received completed USM 285 and Summons re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk to prepare waiver package to defendant upon receipt of initial disclosures form. (adg) Modified on 8/19/2019 (adg).
July 31, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Romonica Lynn Long re #3 Notice to Pro Se Parties, #2 Order, USM 285, and Summons (bnw)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A, Plaintiff's action is ALLOWED TO PROCEED as any other civil action. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form, and to return one of each for each Defendant named in the complaint within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order to the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff is warned that failure to comply in a timely manner could result in the dismissal of this civil action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 7/30/19. (bnw)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Romonica Lynn Long. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 7/30/19. (bnw)
July 30, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (eop)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Romonica Lynn Long. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Cobb County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romonica Lynn Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?