Cipriani v. Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nancy E. Cipriani
Defendant: Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03424
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan by Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jain, Sapna)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thelston Mosley, II on behalf of Nancy E. Cipriani (Mosley, Andrew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors for Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc.. (Van Dyke, Christopher)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/21/2020.(Van Dyke, Christopher) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Nancy E. Cipriani. Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc. served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (dob)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc.. (eop)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Nancy E. Cipriani. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100114438) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cipriani v. Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy E. Cipriani
Represented By: Andrew Thelston Mosley, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Todd Van Dyke
Represented By: Sapna Kumari Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?