Heroes Properties, LLC v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Heroes Properties, LLC
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan and Kathy A. Baran
Case Number: 1:2019cv03460
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge Michael L. Brown no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-3460-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (bjh)
August 16, 2019 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 08/16/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
August 14, 2019 Clerks Approval re #8 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only). Plaintiff filed its document entitled "Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Directing Defendants to Show Cause." (Dkt. #7 .) Plaintiff has not properly presented a request for a temporary restraining order pursuant to Section (n) of the Court's Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. (Dkt. #6 at 8.) Plaintiff shall follow the procedures set forth in the standing order if it requests action from the Court. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/14/2019. (bgt)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-8831057. (Schwartz, Dale)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TRO Motion was filed concurrently with the Complaint. re: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Dale Schwartz)(Schwartz, Dale)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Byung J. Pak, U.S. Attorney. (bjh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli. (bjh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kathy A. Baran. (bjh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kevin K. McAleenan. (bjh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Heroes Properties, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8831057) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exh 1 - 1 of 5, #3 Exh 1 - 2 of 5, #4 Exh 1 - 3 of 5, #5 Exh 1 - 4 of 5, #6 Exh 1 - 5 of 5, #7 Exh 2, #8 Exh 3, #9 Exh 4)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heroes Properties, LLC v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy A. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heroes Properties, LLC
Represented By: Dale M. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?