United States of America v. Burkich et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert C. Burkich, M.D., Preventative Medicine Anti-Aging & Chelation, Inc. and Robert A. Burkich, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03510
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service filed by United States of America. (Wynn, Paris)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of Americawith Jury Demand filed by United States of America.(Wynn, Paris) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert C. Burkich, MD. (bdb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by United States of America (Amended) (Wynn, Paris)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 DOCUMENT RE-FILED CORRECTLY @ #8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by United States of America (Wynn, Paris) Modified on 9/19/2019 (bjh).
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service with Brief In Support by Preventative Medicine Anti-Aging & Chelation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief 1)(Higney, David) Modified on 9/27/2019 to edit text to reflect pdf (bjh).
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by United States of America. Preventative Medicine Anti-Aging & Chelation, Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Wynn, Paris)
August 6, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. The wrong Event type was selected; the correct event is Complaint. (eop)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Preventative Medicine Anti-Aging & Chelation, Inc.. (eop)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert C. Burkich, MD. (eop)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Burkich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Burkich, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preventative Medicine Anti-Aging & Chelation, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Higney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Burkich, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Paris A. Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?