Jeffery et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Wilene Jeffery and Uche Ewo
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Structured Asset Securities Corporation, Aurora Loan Services, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, (MERS), LaSalle Bank, NA and Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03534
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:l332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #17 Order (Ebbs, Arthur)
October 2, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Uche Ewo, Wilene Jeffery re #17 Order. (jpa)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/26/19. (jpa)
September 24, 2019 Submission of #16 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jpa)
September 17, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Uche Ewo, Wilene Jeffery re Case Assigned/Reassigned. (rsh)
September 17, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-CV-3534-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rsh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, (MERS), Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Ebbs, Arthur)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Wilene Jeffery, Uche Ewo. Wells Fargo Bank, NA served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (tcc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Wilene Jeffery, Uche Ewo. Wells Fargo Bank, NA served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (tcc)
August 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Uche Ewo and Wilene Jeffery re #13 Order on Motion to Stay. (usw)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #9 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 08/07/2019. (usw)
August 7, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Uche Ewo and Wilene Jeffery re #12 Order on Motion for TRO. (usw)
August 7, 2019 Submission of #9 PRO SE Emergency MOTION to Stay, MOTION for Reconsideration, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (tcc)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for TRO due to want of jurisdiction. Plaintiffs are ordered to amend their complaint within 7 with adequate jurisdictional allegations. Failure to do so could result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 08/06/2019. (usw)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (tcc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (tcc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay, MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Injunction by Uche Ewo, Wilene Jeffery. (tcc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Mortgage Electronic Registration System, (MERS). (tcc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to LaSalle Bank, NA. (tcc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Structured Asset Securities Corporation. (tcc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.. (tcc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (tcc)
August 5, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Declaratory Relief, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (tcc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Uche Ewo, Wilene Jeffery. (tcc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Declaratory Relief by Uche Ewo, Wilene Jeffery. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(tcc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wilene Jeffery, Uche Ewo. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 114603) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffery et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Arthur Allen Ebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structured Asset Securities Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, (MERS)
Represented By: Arthur Allen Ebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilene Jeffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uche Ewo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?