Heath v. Grady Health Systems
Plaintiff: Rosetta Heath
Defendant: Grady Health Systems and Grady Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 1:2019cv03585
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Grady Memorial Hospital. Discovery ends on 3/2/2020.(Ross, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 23, 2019 Clerks Notation re #11 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
September 21, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons by Rosetta Heath. (Villani, Ralph)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Grady Health Systems with Jury Demand filed by Rosetta Heath.(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #4 Motion for More Definite Statement and GRANTING #7 Motion to Amend. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [7-1]. Defendant shall be permitted to file an appropriate response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this Order. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 09/18/2019. (usw)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Grady Health Systems. (Ross, Michael)
September 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Motion to Amend Complaint with proposed Amended Complaint attached with Brief In Support by Rosetta Heath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Villani, Ralph)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for a More Definitive Statement. The Plaintiff will have up to and through 09/04/2019 to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 08/29/2019. (usw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Defendant's Motion for a More Definite Statement re: #4 MOTION for More Definite Statement up to and through September 4, 2019 with Brief In Support by Rosetta Heath. (Villani, Ralph)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Grady Health Systems. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Ross, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Grady Health Systems. (Ross, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Grady Health Systems with Jury Demand filed by Rosetta Heath. (Filed at state court and contained w/in #1 Notice of Removal).(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Grady Health Systems. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8849599) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heath v. Grady Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady Health Systems
Represented By: Randy C. Gepp
Represented By: Michael Eric Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Randy C. Gepp
Represented By: Michael Eric Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosetta Heath
Represented By: Ralph J. Villani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?