Harris v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Keesha Harris
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv03607
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Keesha Harris. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 9/16/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit proof of service)(Martin, Charles)
September 23, 2019 CLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-3607-CCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jpa)
September 20, 2019 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Keesha Harris. (Martin, Charles)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration (Attorney General). (jpa)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration (Office of the Regional Chief Counsel). (jpa)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Keesha Harris (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Martin, Charles)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (USA only; other summons were not completed.) (jpa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Keesha Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall go forward as any other civil case, and Plaintiff is allowed to proceed without prepayment of a filing fee. Plaintiff is represented by counsel and has not requested that the Court order that service of the summons and complaint be made by the United States Marshal. Counsel for Plaintiff is therefore appointed to effect service of process upon Defendant under Rule 4(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/12/19. (jpa)
August 9, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (tcc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Keesha Harris. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Summons)(tcc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keesha Harris
Represented By: Charles Lee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?