Phan v. City of Doraville et al
Plaintiff: Fred Phan
Defendant: City of Doraville, Regina Williams-Gates, Sean Mahar and John King
Case Number: 1:2019cv03611
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Joint JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by City of Doraville, John King, Sean Mahar, Regina Williams-Gates. (Denton, Laura)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by City of Doraville, John King, Sean Mahar, Regina Williams-Gates.(Gignilliat, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 23, 2019 Remark: Summons to "John F. King" not issued as this name is not a correct party name to this case. Attorney to refile. (rjs)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Fred Phan. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons John King)(McCabe, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Anthony Denton on behalf of City of Doraville, Sean Mahar, Regina Williams-Gates (Denton, Laura)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by City of Doraville, Sean Mahar, Regina Williams-Gates. Discovery ends on 2/3/2020.(Gignilliat, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Regina Williams-Gates. (tcc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sean Mahar. (tcc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to City of Doraville. (tcc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Fred Phan. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8853549) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phan v. City of Doraville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Doraville
Represented By: Richard Read Gignilliat
Represented By: Laura Anthony Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Williams-Gates
Represented By: Richard Read Gignilliat
Represented By: Laura Anthony Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Mahar
Represented By: Richard Read Gignilliat
Represented By: Laura Anthony Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John King
Represented By: Richard Read Gignilliat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Phan
Represented By: James Metzger McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?