Sugarloaf Capital Buford, LLC v. La Quinta Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sugarloaf Capital Buford, LLC
Defendant: La Quinta Franchising, LLC and Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03623
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David S. Sager re #13 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (tcc)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission of David S. Sager Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/9/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tcc)
October 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of David S. Sager Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8977308). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney David S. Sager added appearing on behalf of La Quinta Franchising, LLC, La Quinta Franchising, LLC, Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC, Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC (pmb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #10 Order Regarding Civil Litigation (Frazier, Delia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of David S. Sager Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8977308). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by La Quinta Franchising, LLC, La Quinta Franchising, LLC, Amanda Joyce Pope, James Arthur Pope, David S. Sager, Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC, Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC. (Frazier, Delia) Modified on 10/4/2019 to correct text (jed).
October 2, 2019 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons, #7 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed and approved by SDG (kmj)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/26/19. (jpa)
September 30, 2019 Submission of #8 MOTION to Substitute Party Wyndham Resorts and Hotels, LLC, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jpa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint ( Discovery ends on 2/24/2020.), First COUNTERCLAIM against Sugarloaf Capital Buford, LLC by La Quinta Franchising, LLC, Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Anticipated Default Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Final Default Letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D LaQuinta Termination Letter)(Frazier, Delia) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 16, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge William M. Ray, II no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-CV-3263-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rlb)
September 13, 2019 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Party Wyndham Resorts and Hotels, LLC with Brief In Support by Sugarloaf Capital Buford, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Knight, Bryan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Sugarloaf Capital Buford, LLC. (Knight, Bryan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against La Quinta Franchising, LLC, Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC filed by Sugarloaf Capital Buford, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Exs. B-P)(Knight, Bryan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 30, October 18 - 22, November 24 - December 3, December 26 - January 7 2020, by Bryan M. Knight. (Knight, Bryan)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. La Quinta Franchising, LLC and Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC Answer due 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 8/15/19. (rlb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint by La Quinta Franchising, LLC, Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Frazier, Delia)
August 14, 2019 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by La Quinta Franchising, LLC and Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC identifying Corporate Parent, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. for La Quinta Franchising, LLC and Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC. Other Affiliate, Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC for Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC; and Other Affiliate, Lodge Holdco II L.L.C. for La Quinta Franchising, LLC. (eop)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by La Quinta Franchising, LLC and Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8856803) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sugarloaf Capital Buford, LLC v. La Quinta Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sugarloaf Capital Buford, LLC
Represented By: Bryan M. Knight
Represented By: Sherri G. Buda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Quinta Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Christopher G. Campbell
Represented By: Delia Gervin Frazier
Represented By: David S. Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC
Represented By: Christopher G. Campbell
Represented By: Delia Gervin Frazier
Represented By: David S. Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?