Aaron's, Inc. v. MKW Investments, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aaron's, Inc.
Defendant: MKW II Investments, LLC, Susan Welker, Kevin Welker and MKW Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03652
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron's, Inc.. Susan Welker waiver mailed on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Conger, Ava)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron's, Inc.. MKW Investments, Inc. waiver mailed on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Conger, Ava)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron's, Inc.. MKW II Investments, LLC waiver mailed on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Conger, Ava)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron's, Inc.. Kevin Welker waiver mailed on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Conger, Ava)
August 19, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Aaron, Inc. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Aaron's, Inc.. (Conger, Ava)
August 16, 2019 NEF regenerated for #1 Complaint and #2 Order (aaq)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/16/19. (jpa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Aaron's, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8862160) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron's, Inc. v. MKW Investments, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron's, Inc.
Represented By: Ava Conger
Represented By: John P. Jett
Represented By: Burleigh Lavisky Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MKW II Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Welker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Welker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MKW Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?