Fabien v. ARV Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Claudius Michael Fabien
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., ARV Properties, LLC, Ditech Financial, LLC and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03720
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: J Clay Fuller
2 Judge: John K Larkins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:l332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Claudius Michael Fabien. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Claudius Michael Fabien re #3 Order. (ddm)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff Claudius Michael Fabien's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #1 and directing that Plaintiff file a more definite complaint pursuant to Rule 12(e) on or before October 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 9/5/19. (ddm)
September 3, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (ddm)
September 3, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Claudius Michael Fabien re #2 Order. (ddm)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-3720-JPB-JKL. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 9/3/19. (ddm)
August 21, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (bnp)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Claudius Michael Fabien. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fabien v. ARV Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARV Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudius Michael Fabien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?