Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. v. I-Blason, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.
Defendant: I-Blason, LLC and Congjing Technology (Shenzhen) Co. Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv03774
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 3, 2019 to September 23, 2019, October 4, 2019 to October 7, 2019, November 20, 2019 to November 25, 2019, and December 23, 2019 to January 2, 2020, by Carl Hugo Anderson, Jr. (Anderson, Carl)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HF Holdings, Inc. for Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.. (Anderson, Carl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8879927) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Congjing Technology (Shenzhen) Co. Limited, I-Blason, LLC. (Attachments: #1 I-Blason)(jpa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. v. I-Blason, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-Blason, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congjing Technology (Shenzhen) Co. Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Hugo Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: Brittany Frandsen
Represented By: James W. McConkie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?