Federal Insurance Company v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03837
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Regarding Initial Disclosures (Rule 5.4) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Harley, Gregory)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Regarding Discovery by Federal Insurance Company.(McLean, Jennifer)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Federal Insurance Company. (McLean, Jennifer)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Discovery ends on 2/14/2020.(Harley, Gregory) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company (WFC) for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Harley, Gregory)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Chubb Corporation for Federal Insurance Company. (McLean, Jennifer)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Answer due 9/17/2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/28/2019. (rjs)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harley, Gregory)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8889809) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gregory F. Harley
Represented By: Kwende B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles David Hailey
Represented By: Jennifer Theobold McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?